U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00332-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Protective Order ]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 04, 2022: [Suppress]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Suppress]
  • November 09, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 28, 2022: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case]
  • October 27, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 27, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 12, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 11, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.