U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00330-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HILTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 18, 2023: [Response to motion]
  • January 13, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.