U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00335-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DEATON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 18, 2023: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Expedite ]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 17, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Expedite ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.