U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00333-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Interim Payment]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Dismiss Count(s)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Sentencing]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 14, 2022: [Travel ]
  • November 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 25, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 12, 2022: [Add Counts]
  • October 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.