U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00321-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PARKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 05, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Error]
  • January 12, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 12, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 12, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 11, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.