U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00334-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SLYE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 03, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 03, 2023: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 03, 2023: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 03, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Exclude]
  • December 01, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
  • November 09, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 19, 2022: [Errata]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • October 19, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 12, 2022: [Indictment]
  • October 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.