U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00216-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SLAUGHTER et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 13, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.