U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00436-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LOPEZ et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 19, 2023: [Vacate]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 02, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 17, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 17, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 14, 2022: [Redacted Indictment]
  • October 14, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 14, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.