U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00095
  • Case Name: SUBPOENA SERVED ON LEON MAURICE ROWE et al v. ROWE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Motion For Order]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 17, 2022: [Motion to Compel (Initiating)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.