U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00096
  • Case Name: IN RE: JEFFREY B. CLARK
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • November 07, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response to motion]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Quash]
  • October 28, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 24, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 21, 2022: [Errata]
  • October 21, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • October 19, 2022: [Quash]
  • October 19, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 18, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)]
  • October 18, 2022: [Stay]
  • October 18, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.