U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00344-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HORVATH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 23, 2023: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 23, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 23, 2023: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Referred for PSI Report]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.