U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00341-1
  • Case Name: USA v. EDWARDS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 02, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 02, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 28, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 19, 2022: [Indictment]
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.