U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00097
  • Case Name: SCANLAN v. AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP INC. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 24, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 20, 2022: [Motion to Compel (Initiating)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.