U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00345-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HEDRICK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Protective Order ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Reply in Support]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2022: [Suppress]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • November 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • October 24, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Medical/Mental Health Alert]
  • October 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 21, 2022: [Indictment]
  • October 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.