U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00224-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ESCALERA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 27, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 24, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 21, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • October 21, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.