U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00198-
  • Case Name: K Street, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Pay]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Pay]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice of Filing of Transcript]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Status Report]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Transcript]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • March 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • March 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
February, 2025
  • February 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
January, 2025
  • January 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
December, 2024
  • December 27, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Leave]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Continued]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Consent Order]
  • January 21, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors (by Trustee)]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 07, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order - Generic]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • December 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Consent Order]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Approving]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • December 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • December 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice - Generic]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors (by Trustee)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Opposition]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended List of Creditors and Schedules (Adding, Deleting, Changes to Debt Amount or Reclassificati]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Matrix or Schedules: Change EXISITING Name and/or Address]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury - Form 202]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule H]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule G]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule E/F]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule D]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Schedule A/B]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Attorney)]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • November 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • November 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • November 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Approve]
  • November 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • November 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • November 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Amended Voluntary Petition]
October, 2022
  • October 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Examination]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Examination]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • October 26, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • October 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • October 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • October 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims (Original or Amended)]
  • October 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.