U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00350-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ADAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Protective Order ]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.