U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00228-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ARREDONDO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • November 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 11, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 11, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 09, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Complaint]
  • October 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 27, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.