U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00200-
  • Case Name: Stephon Jean Owens
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • November 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • November 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • November 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedule C]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • October 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Personal Financial Managment Course]
  • October 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • October 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Disclosure of Compensation of BPP for Debtor]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Declaration by BPP - Form 119]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.