U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00229-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RUTLEDGE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Exclude]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 23, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 27, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • October 27, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.