U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00226-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BARTOW et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 31, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 31, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 28, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 28, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.