U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00225-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KUECKEN et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 31, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 31, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 31, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.