U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00205-
  • Case Name: Adams 3, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley David [Operating Report]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley David [Employ]
  • January 21, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley David [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley David [Employ]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley David [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley David [Continuation of Utility Service]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley David [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley David [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley David [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley David [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors (by Trustee)]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley David [Proposed Order]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley David [Order - Generic]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley David [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley David [Expedite Hearing]
  • January 16, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley David [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • January 15, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley David [Expedite Hearing]
  • January 15, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley David [Continuation of Utility Service]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley David [Employ]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley D. [Employ]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley D. [Appearance (Attorney)]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jones, Bradley D. [Exhibit]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Approving]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors (by Trustee)]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Approve]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice Appointing Ch. 11 Trustee]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appoint Trustee]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing (Original or Amended)]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Condition Rights]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case -Trustee]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case (Trustee)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Condition Rights]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appoint Trustee]
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors (by Trustee)]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Prohibit Cash Collateral]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Generic Motion ]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing - Scheduled (by Order) BK]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • November 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • November 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Prohibit Use Cash Collateral]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 03, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [First Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • November 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • November 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • November 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.