U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00233-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCCOMBS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 04, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 02, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • November 02, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.