U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00108
  • Case Name: IN RE SUBPOENA ISSUED TO BUREAU OF PRISONS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • December 16, 2022: [.Order]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Quash]
  • November 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Removal of Subpoena]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.