U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00354-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SLAUGHTER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 04, 2022: [Exclude]
  • December 04, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 12, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.