U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00107
  • Case Name: ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. et al v. TCL INDUSTRIES HOLDINGS CO., LTD. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Appointment of Commissioner & Issuance of Letters Rogatory]
  • November 09, 2022: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 04, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 03, 2022: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • November 03, 2022: [Appointment of Commissioner and Issuance of Letters Rogatory]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.