U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00109
  • Case Name: MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO NON-PARTY JOURNALIST CARL PRINE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Declaration]
  • January 13, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 12, 2023: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • January 04, 2023: [Status Report]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 08, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.