U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00241-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PATERSON et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Sentencing Guidelines]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • November 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • November 20, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 15, 2022: [Appear]
  • November 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • November 10, 2022: [Appear]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order of Distribution of Funds]
  • November 04, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Location Start]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.