U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00232-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SIZER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • November 16, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 10, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 09, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 07, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 03, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.