U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00357-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ALLEN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue ]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 04, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 03, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 20, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 12, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 12, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 12, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 08, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 07, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 07, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 04, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.