U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00349-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHASE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • March 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 10, 2024: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 10, 2024: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 10, 2024: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 10, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 10, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 10, 2024: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 08, 2024: [Information - Felony]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 27, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • December 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 02, 2022: [Leave to Join]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • November 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 16, 2022: [Bond Set/Reset]
  • November 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 11, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Review]
  • November 10, 2022: [Stay]
  • November 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 09, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Stay]
  • November 09, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 09, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 09, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • November 07, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • November 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • November 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 04, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 04, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 04, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • November 04, 2022: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.