U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00209
  • Case Name: Lisa A. Powell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing Notice - Hearing Continued - Trustee]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors Held (With Attachments)]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Request to Withdraw Document]
  • November 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Compensation]
  • November 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • November 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • November 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.