U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00237-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHOLOD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 15, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 15, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • November 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 09, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 07, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.