U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00112
  • Case Name: COZY, INC. v. DOREL JUVENILE GROUP, INC.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • December 13, 2022: [Disclosure]
  • December 13, 2022: [Response to motion]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • November 29, 2022: [Quash]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • November 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 17, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • November 08, 2022: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.