U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00358-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BARTOW et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Return of Passport]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Return of Passport ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Leave to File Review]
  • April 17, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Receipt for Passport]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 30, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 30, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 30, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • November 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.