U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00362-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PROCTOR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 20, 2023: [Release from Custody ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • January 19, 2023: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2023: [Release from Custody ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Certificate of Service ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 11, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 11, 2023: [Temporary Detention ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Arrest ]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.