U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00212-
  • Case Name: Tavion Daniels
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Continued (TRUSTEE ONLY 341 Filings)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Amended Voluntary Petition]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Have the Filing Fee Waived]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Schedules A/B-J]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury - Form 202]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Application to Have the Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.