U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00210
  • Case Name: Patricia L. Washington
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Continued (TRUSTEE ONLY 341 Filings)]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [UST Statement of Declination]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Presumed Abuse]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Hearing Continued]
November, 2022
  • November 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.