U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00249-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BRYANT
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • December 21, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
November, 2022
  • November 20, 2022: [Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearings]
  • November 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 20, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
  • November 15, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Arrest - Rule 5]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.