U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00183-
  • Case Name: Wilma Zanganeh and David Zanganeh
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order To Close Case & Discharge Trustee - Ch 7 No Asset (Discharged)]
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 10, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.