U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00246-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCCOMBS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 16, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • November 16, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • November 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • November 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 14, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 14, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 11, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • November 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.