U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00214
  • Case Name: Judith A. Webster
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 14, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order For Debtor's Employer To Pay Trustee]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Proposed Order]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Pre-Confirmation Certificate]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Change of Address]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors Held (With Attachments)]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.