U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00213-
  • Case Name: Lindsay Marissa Osborne
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Schedules A/B-J]
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: White, William Douglas [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.