U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00215-
  • Case Name: Danielle Pennington
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order for Relief]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Document (Do NOT use this event if amending creditor list or schedules A-J)]
  • January 21, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • January 16, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Exhibit]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Witness and Exhibit List]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Response]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Motion - Generic (USE ONLY IF NO OTHER EVENT MATCHES)]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Response]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order To Show Cause Failure To Pay Installments]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors Held (With Attachments)]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors Not Held]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Amended Document (Do NOT use this event if amending creditor list or schedules A-J)]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Employee Income Records / Payment Advices (Original or Amended)]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee)]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Original or Amended)]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Appearance (Attorney)]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.