U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00216-
  • Case Name: Brandon Enoch
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [13 Chapter 13 Trustee Final Report and Account]
  • January 15, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order Dismiss Case]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Hearing - Continued (BK)]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order To Show Cause Failure To Pay Installments]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement Adjourning (Continuing) Meeting of Creditors (by Trustee)]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Order To Show Cause]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income 122C-1 (Original or Amended)]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule E/F]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule D]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule C]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Schedule A/B]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors Not Held]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [eNoticing Request Form]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [List of Creditors and Mailing Matrix]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Herr, Rebecca A. [First Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assigned)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.