U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-00217
  • Case Name: Joel Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Certification About A Financial Management Course (Original or Amended)]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Notice Of Requirement To File Certification About A Financial Management Course (Ch 7)]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card (ADI)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ross, Bryan S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.