U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00365-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MIGLIORE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • March 19, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 17, 2023: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 17, 2023: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 19, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • December 19, 2022: [Temporary Detention ]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 21, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 15, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 15, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.