U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00372-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VARNEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 02, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 02, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 02, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 02, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 02, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 16, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 16, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.