U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00373-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ARREDONDO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • December 01, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • December 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.